Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Maharaj, Deonarine (CPSO#: 23076)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Westmount Medical Walk In Clinic 925 Wonderland Road London ON
Instructions: Write or call 519.641.6081
Date Received: 13 Aug 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2013