Maharaj, Neil (CPSO#: 79117)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 10
4728 Dorchester Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H9
Phone: (289) 296-3157
Fax: (905) 353-1269
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neil Maharaj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Maharaj ( CPSO# 79117 )

Business Address:
10 - 4728 Dorchester Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 7H9
Phone Number: (289) 296-3157

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 31 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL MAHARAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHARAJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 13 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 14 Dec 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 19 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Dec 2005 to 20 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2012 to 27 Jan 2012
Elective Trainee - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2007