Maharajh, Gyaandeo Seusaran (CPSO#: 62312)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Cardiovascular Surgery
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3256
Fax: (613) 738-4835
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Canada
Phone: (613) 761-3126
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Maharajh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Maharajh ( CPSO# 62312 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4318

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GYAANDEO SEUSARAN MAHARAJH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHARAJH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 7 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2000