Maharajh, Kamla (CPSO#: 67773)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 720-2003
Fax: (705) 720-2109
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Powell and Maharajh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Powell ( CPSO# 67765 )
Dr. K. Maharajh ( CPSO# 67773 )

Business Address:
208 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 720-2003

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMLA MAHARAJH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHARAJH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999