Maharajh, Sastri Narendra (CPSO#: 55746)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 12 Dec 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 101
3420 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A9
Phone: (905) 272-0165
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 05 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 05 Nov 2013
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 05 Jul 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 05 Nov 2013 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., November 5, 2013, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certiificate of registration held
            by Dr. Sastri Narendra Maharajh:

            *     Dr. Maharajh's practice shall be restricted to male patients only.

            *     Dr. Maharajh shall post a clearly visible sign in his waiting room, and
                  any waiting room where he practises, stating that he may only treat male
                  patients.

            *     Dr. Maharajh shall continue in individual psychodynamic psychotherapy
                  with a College-approved psychiatrist who shall provide written reports to
                  the CPSO every six (6) months.

            *     Dr. Maharajh shall reimburse the College for funding for any therapy and
                  counselling provided to up to six of the patients referred to in the
                  Agreed Statement of Facts for Penalty Hearing, and shall, within three
                  (3) months of the date of this order, post additional security acceptable
                  to the College, in the amount of $96,360.00, to guarantee payment of such
                  amounts.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 29 Jul 2013
Summary:

On July 29, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Sastri Narendra Maharajh committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient, and in 
that he has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable 
or unprofessional. Dr. Maharajh admitted the allegations.  
 
Dr. Maharajh is a family physician practicing in Mississauga, Ontario. Patient A was a patient of 
Dr. Maharajh's since approximately 1992. She had several ultrasounds of the breast performed in 
order to investigate breast masses, which were always benign. 
 
On July 5, 2011, Patient A attended for an appointment with Dr. Maharajh. Her complaints that 
day included wheezing and ongoing pain in the left breast. Dr. Maharajh examined Patient A's 
ears, nose and throat first and found that her throat was red. He told Patient A that she likely had 
a viral infection. Dr. Maharajh next began examining Patient A's chest with his stethoscope.  He 
asked her to take deep breaths, with her head turned sideways towards the wall. At this point, 
Patient A was lying on the exam table with her left arm under her head.  The wall was on her left 
hand side, and Dr. Maharajh was standing to her right. She was not wearing a gown. 
 
Dr. Maharajh instructed Patient A to breathe deeply, and he placed the head of the stethoscope on 
her chest. He listened to both lung fields. At this point in the examination, Patient A felt 
something odd on her right nipple. She noticed that Dr. Maharajh's head was close to her chest. 
She felt something warm and pinching on her nipple. Dr. Maharajh instructed Patient A to breath 
and then quickly put his lips on her nipple. This occurred three times. Patient A turned her head 
to look and saw Dr. Maharajh cupping her nipple with his mouth. Patient A said, "What are you 
doing?"  Dr. Maharajh stood up and said "Nothing".   
 
Dr. Maharajh has disclosed to the College that between approximately 2005 and 2011, he 
engaged in conduct that was similar to the inappropriate conduct engaged in with Patient A, with 
approximately ten to twelve other female patients. For each of these ten to twelve patients, Dr. 
Maharajh acknowledges that he either placed his mouth on the patient's breast, or he rested his 
cheek lightly on the patient's breast. 
 
On November 5, 2013, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Maharajh's certificate of registration for eight (8) months.     
      This suspension is to take effect immediately. 
2.    The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Maharajh's 
      certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time: 
 
      a.    Dr. Maharajh's practice shall be restricted to male patients only.  
      b.    Dr. Maharajh shall post a clearly visible sign in his waiting room, and any waiting 
            room where he practises, stating that he may only treat male patients. 
      c.    Dr. Maharajh shall continue in individual psychodynamic psychotherapy with a 
            College-approved psychiatrist who shall provide written reports to the CPSO 
            every six (6) months. 
 
3.    Dr. Maharajh appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
 
4.    Dr. Maharajh reimburse the College for funding provided to Patient A under the program 
      required under section 85.7 of the Code, and shall, within three (3) months of the date of 
      this order, post security acceptable to the College, in the amount of $16,060.00, to 
      guarantee the payment of such amounts. 
 
5.    The Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Maharajh's 
      certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time: 
 
      a.    Dr. Maharajh shall reimburse the College for funding for any therapy and 
            counselling provided to up to six of the patients referred to in the Agreed 
            Statement of Facts for Penalty Hearing, and shall, within three (3) months of the 
            date of this order, post additional security acceptable to the College, in the amount 
            of $96,360.00, to guarantee payment of such amounts. 
 
6.    The parties may make written submissions with respect of the costs of the hearing. The 
      College shall provide its submissions within ten (10) days of the release of this Order. Dr. 
      Maharajh shall provide his submissions within ten (10) days of receipt of the College's 
      submissions. The College shall have a further five (5) days after receipt of Dr. Maharajh's 
      submissions to make any reply submission. Should independent legal counsel provide the 
      Committee with advice in respect of costs, such advice shall be provided to counsel for 
      their comments. 
 
On February 4, 2014, the Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Maharajh to pay costs to the College 
in the amount of $8,920.00 within 60 days of the date of this Order. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): July 29 and 30, 2013