Mahassni, Samia Hassan Mohammad (CPSO#: 80182)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2003 to 03 Nov 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 04 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 05 Nov 2004
Clinical Fellow - Trauma

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Nov 2004