Mahboub, Bassam Hasan Saleh Hasan (CPSO#: 77118)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 10 Oct 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 10 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 11 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 10 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 11 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2005