Mahdavi-Nezarati, Marjan (CPSO#: 71997)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street - 3SE
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6838
Fax: (416) 756-6727
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARJAN MAHDAVI-NEZARATI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHDAVI-NEZARATI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Nov 1997 to 28 Nov 1997
Elective Trainee - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 05 May 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Elective Trainee - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Nov 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1999