Mahendira, Dharini (CPSO#: 84680)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
3 - 057 Bond Wing
Rheumatology Department
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5295
Fax: (416) 864-5139
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dharini Mahendira Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mahendira ( CPSO# 84680 )

Business Address:
St Michaels Hospital
3-058/3-060 Bond Wing
Rheumatology Department
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5295

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DHARINI MAHENDIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHENDIRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2010