Mahendra, Ashish (CPSO#: 85895)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Lucknow, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 26 Feb 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 27 Feb 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007