Maher, Caroline Bernadette (CPSO#: 72116)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1998