Maher, John Thomas (CPSO#: 68928)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Bradford Street
Barrie ON  L4N 1W2
Phone: (705) 726-5033
Fax: (705) 726-4887
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN THOMAS MAHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Jan 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jan 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2001