Maher, Maurica (CPSO#: 69028)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
First Nations and Inuit Health Bran
Health Canada
Room D427, 2720 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone: 613 941 8120
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAURICA MAHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 04 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2010 to 14 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Mar 2011 to 14 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014