Maheshwari, Ekta (CPSO#: 87396)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Jiwaji University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ekta Maheshwari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 25 2014

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 10 Sep 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 11 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2013