Mahmoodi, Mahnaz (CPSO#: 91279)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Family Health Team
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 853-3103
Fax: (905) 853-2533
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Simcoderm
5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahnaz Mahmoodi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mahmoodi ( CPSO# 91279 )

Business Address:
Southlake Family Health Team
Suite 201
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 853-3103

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHNAZ MAHMOODI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHMOODI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011