Mahmoud, Saad Abdullah Abdulrahman (CPSO#: 77016)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 30 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005