Mahomed, Mohamed Nizar Noorallah (CPSO#: 65261)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Kansas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2016