Mahon, Jeffrey Lewis (CPSO#: 57609)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Care London
Room B5 109
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6335
Fax: (519) 646-6331
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mahon-Rowe Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mahon ( CPSO# 57609 )
Dr. P. Rowe Mahon ( CPSO# 57436 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Care
Endocrinology and Metabolism
268 Grosvenor Street, Room B5-109
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6335

Business Address:
HPHA - Stratford Site
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY LEWIS MAHON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1986