Mahon, Michael Anthony (CPSO#: 19361)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 15 Nov 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1964
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 16 Mar 1998
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 16 Apr 1998
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 15 Mar 1999
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 13 Apr 1999
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 15 Nov 2001

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Nov 2001
Summary:

 On November 15, 2001 the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Mahon(s plea of guilty and found him 
 guilty of professional misconduct and incompetence and ordered his certficate of registration be 
 revoked immediately.

On November 15, 2001, Dr. Michael Anthony Mahon signed the following 
 undertaking:

I, Dr. Michael Anthony Mahon, undertake to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
 Ontario that I will not apply to the College for reinstatement of my certificate of registration 
 or for another certificate of registration to prctise medicine in Ontario.

I, Dr. Michael Anthony 
 Mahon, expressly consent to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario placing the 
 information found in this undertaking on the public register kept under s. 23 of the Health 
 Professions Procedural Code.

I, Dr. Michael Anthony Mahon, have read this undertaking, have been 
 advised to seek independent legal advice, and confirm that I understand the significance of what I 
 am undertaking to do.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 15, 2001


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 17 Nov 1997
Summary:

 In November 1997, Dr. Mahon pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to carry out the terms of an agreement 
 with a patient, contrary to s. 27(10); in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of 
 the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32).  The Discipline 
 Committee accepted Dr. Mahon(s guilty plea, and found him guilty of professional misconduct.

The 
 Discipline Committee accepted the terms of the Memorandum of Agreement and ordered the 
 following:

 1)	That Dr. Mahon be reprimanded with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the 
 Register. The reprimand administered, waived right of appeal

2)	That a 60-day suspension of the 
 certificate of registration be imposed with the following conditions:

i)	that the first 30 days 
 shall commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar.  This date is shall not be less than 90 
 days or more than 120 days after this order becomes final.

ii)	that the second 30 days of the 
 suspension shall commence one year later, to the day, that the first suspension 
 commences.

iii)	any or all of these periods of suspension shall be suspended on proof to the 
 satisfaction of the Registrar that full payment of $7,000.00 has been made by Dr. Mohan to the 
 complainant.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 17, 1997

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: November 15, 2001
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Michael Anthony Mahon provided the following Undertaking to the College of Physicians and
Surgeons of Ontario (CPSO) on November 15, 2001, and consented to its entry in the public
register of the CPSO:
Dr. Michael Anthony Mahon undertakes to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
that he will not apply to the College for reinstatement of his certificate of registration
or apply for another certificate of registration to practise medicine in Ontario.