Mahoney, Charles James (CPSO#: 51083)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Alder Medical Center 277 Evergreen Road Campbell River BC V9W 5Y4
Date Received: 01 Jun 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017