Mahoney, Daniel Joseph (CPSO#: 54490)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 Richmond Street
Chatham ON  N7M 1R2
Phone: (519) 352-9934
Fax: (519) 352-0598
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel Joseph Mahoney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mahoney ( CPSO# 54490 )

Business Address:
555 Richmond Street
Chatham ON  N7M 1R2
Phone Number: (519) 352-9934

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL JOSEPH MAHONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHONEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1986