Mahoney, Donna Gladys (CPSO#: 58471)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
140 Woodbridge Avenue
Units 9 & 10
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4K9
Phone: (905) 850-0753
Fax: (905) 850-2041
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA GLADYS MAHONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHONEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1988