Mahoney, Mary-Helen (CPSO#: 84259)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 211
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 554-9860
Fax: (416) 491-7022
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mary-Helen Mahoney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mahoney ( CPSO# 84259 )

Business Address:
Suite 211
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 554-9860

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY-HELEN MAHONEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHONEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2011