Mahoney, Meagan Eileen (CPSO#: 80728)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: Hamel, Meagan Eileen (used until: 15 Jun 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Aug 2011