Mahoney, Paul Richard (CPSO#: 21326)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Jul 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Oct 1999