Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Mahut, Catherine Anne (CPSO#: 58094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll free: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 05 Jun 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ANNE MAHUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHUT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1988