Mahzari, Moeber Mohammed Mosa (CPSO#: 94991)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Khalid University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 04 May 2011 to 31 May 2011
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 26 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2015