Mai, Andrew David (CPSO#: 58151)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
114 Cameron Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 0X1
Phone: 613-260-2907
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mai Clark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 5 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW DAVID MAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 10 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2003