Mailis, Angela (CPSO#: 50671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Names: Hamodraka Malis, Angeliki Nikolaou (used until: 02 May 1993 )     Hamodraka Mailis, Angeliki Nikolaou (used until: 03 Jan 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Athens, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pain & Wellness Centre
2301 Major MacKenzie Dr West
Unit 101
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z3
Phone: 1-800-597-5733 Ext. 3
Fax: 844-358-9308
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angela Mailis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mailis ( CPSO# 50671 )

Business Address:
101 - 2301 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z3
Phone Number: (416) 882-1669

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 03 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELA MAILIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAILIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1983