Mailloux, Caroline (CPSO#: 79565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Names: Marceau-Mailloux, Caroline (used until: 26 Sep 2007 )     Mailloux, Caroline (used until: 27 Jun 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
555 Barrydowne Rd
Sudbury
Sudbury ON  P3A 3T4
Phone: (705) 524-7419
Fax: (705) 524-9087
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7147
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Caroline Mailloux Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Mailloux ( CPSO# 79565 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7147

Business Address:
555 Barrydowne Road
Sudbury ON  P3A 3T4
Phone Number: (705) 524-7419

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
St Joseph's Continuing Care Centre,Sudbury Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jan 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE MAILLOUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAILLOUX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 15 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2006