Maimon, Moshe Nimrod (CPSO#: 80245)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ben Gurion University of the Negev, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 17 Dec 2003
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Dec 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005