Main, Alayne Jean Marie (CPSO#: 60908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: Warwaruk, Alayne Jean Marie (used until: 07 Jun 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Palladium Medical Clinic
308 Palladium Drive
Suite 210
Kanata ON  K2V 1A1
Phone: (613) 599-3422
Fax: (613) 599-6922
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alayne Main Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Main ( CPSO# 60908 )

Business Address:
Palladium Medical Clinic
Suite 210
308 Palladium Drive
Kanata ON  K2V 1A1
Phone Number: (613) 599-3422

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAYNE JEAN MARIE MAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1990