Main, Cheryl Lea (CPSO#: 72262)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 1 - 87
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-0271 Ext. 46111
Fax: (905) 577-8027
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 31 Aug 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 15 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERYL LEA MAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 31 Aug 2002 to 30 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 31 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2002