Maingi, Manish (CPSO#: 64042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2000 Credit Valley Road
Suite 412
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone: (905) 828-4000
Fax: (905) 828-7533
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manish Maingi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Maingi ( CPSO# 64042 )

Business Address:
412 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga ON  L5M 4N4
Phone Number: (905) 828-4000

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 The Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
The Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 27 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANISH MAINGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAINGI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1992