Maingot-Douketis, Maria Julie (CPSO#: 64120)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wardenwood Health Centre
2361 Warden Avenue
Toronto ON  M1T 1V7
Phone: (416) 299-4999
Electoral District: 10

Medical Records Location

Address: Former patients of Dr. Maingot-Douketis from the Yonge-Eglinton Medical Centre can access their medical records by contacting: The Yonge-Eglinton Medical Centre Suite 207 2401 Yonge Street Toronto, Ontario M4P 3H1 Tel: (416) 483-8382
Date Received: 26 Jan 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA JULIE MAINGOT-DOUKETIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAINGOT-DOUKETIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Apr 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Nov 1995
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1996