Maini, Bharat (CPSO#: 66307)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Apr 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 1993


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of London, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 876-5038
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bharat Maini Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2008

Dr. B. Maini ( CPSO# 66307 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5038

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay


Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. BHARAT MAINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAINI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1993
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Apr 1995