Mainprize, Thomas Charles (CPSO#: 55088)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000