Mainprize, Todd Graham (CPSO#: 70268)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Division of Neurosugery
2075 Bayview Avenue Suite A134
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4739
Fax: (416) 480-6085
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.G. Mainprize Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mainprize ( CPSO# 70268 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
Division of Neurosurgery
2075 Bayview Avenue Suite A134
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4739

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TODD GRAHAM MAINPRIZE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAINPRIZE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008