Mainville, Barbara Joan (CPSO#: 55415)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1986

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Middlebrook, Barbara Joan (used until: 24 Nov 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1385 Bank Street, Suite 305
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N4
Phone: (613) 627-2280
Fax: (613) 730-6743
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA JOAN MAINVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAINVILLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1986

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 22, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)