Maisonneuve, Rachel Jeanne (CPSO#: 60714)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1991


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
227 Algonquin Boulevard West
Timmins ON  P4N 2R8
Phone: (705) 267-5511
Fax: (705) 264-6373
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rachel Maisonneuve Medicine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2009

Dr. R. Maisonneuve ( CPSO# 60714 )

Business Address:
Unit 3
227 Algonquin Boulevard West
Timmins ON  P4N 2R8
Phone Number: (705) 267-0450

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. RACHEL JEANNE MAISONNEUVE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAISONNEUVE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1991