Majeed, Habeeb (CPSO#: 98321)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Chronic Diseases Centre
2330 Kennedy Road, Suite 210
Scarborough ON  M1T0A2
Canada
Phone: (416)335-1717
Fax: (416)335-1719
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Multi-Speciality Walk in Clinic
21 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B6
Canada
Phone: 905-897-9228
Fax: (905)-897-7780
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HABEEB MAJEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJEED is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 10 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2017