Majewski, Jakub (CPSO#: 86262)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 210
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 680-9092
Fax: (613)680-9093
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: (613) 721-4788
Fax: 613-721-4763
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jakub Majewski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Majewski ( CPSO# 86262 )

Business Address:
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4

Business Address:
210 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 680-9092

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAKUB MAJEWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJEWSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2012