Majid, Nadine (CPSO#: 82773)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Summerville Family Health Team
Central Location
101 Queensway West 5th Floor
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-9700 Ext. ext2
Fax: (905) 272-1416
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nadine Majid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Majid ( CPSO# 82773 )

Business Address:
Summerville Family Health Team
Central Location
101 Queensway West, 5th Floor
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-9700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NADINE MAJID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2007