Majid, Pirzada Abdul (CPSO#: 42409)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Patna University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 23 Oct 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 1998