Majl, Lance Brian (CPSO#: 66689)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jan 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 211
3420 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 2R6
Phone: (416) 498-6255
Fax: (416) 498-9555
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lance B. Majl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Majl ( CPSO# 66689 )

Business Address:
Suite 211
3420 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 2R6
Phone Number: (416) 498-6255

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 14 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LANCE BRIAN MAJL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 1997 to 14 Jan 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 1998 to 14 Jan 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 1999 to 14 Jan 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2000