Majmudar, Vallari (CPSO#: 102567)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Applewood Village Plaza
210-1077 North Service Rd
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1A6
Phone: 905-273-9009
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 13 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALLARI MAJMUDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJMUDAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Feb 2014 to 27 Apr 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 28 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 01 Feb 2015
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 02 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2017