Major, Nathalie (CPSO#: 65108)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Names: Cook, Nathalie (used until: 08 Mar 2016 )     Major, Nathalie (used until: 25 Oct 1994 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2664
Fax: (613) 738-4878
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathalie Major Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Major ( CPSO# 65108 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital Of Eastern
Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHALIE MAJOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAJOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1993