Mak, Kelvin (CPSO#: 63712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St.
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000 Ext. 3339
Fax: (416) 635-2401
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelvin Mak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mak ( CPSO# 63712 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6183

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Branson Site
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELVIN MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jun 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1992