Mak, Manson Mang Tsun (CPSO#: 67036)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0Z9
Phone: (905) 451-1937
Fax: (905) 451-8272
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 9
1170 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5C 4E6
Canada
Phone: (905) 281-9337
Fax: (905) 281-9849
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manson M.T. Mak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mak ( CPSO# 67036 )

Business Address:
1170 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Unit 9
Mississauga ON  L4C 4E6
Phone Number: (905) 281-9337

Business Address:
200 - 60 Gillingham Drive
Brampton ON  L6X 0Z9
Phone Number: (905) 451-1937

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Feb 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANSON MANG TSUN MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Mar 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Apr 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Mar 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 1997