Mak, Shui Chung Ernie (CPSO#: 84519)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Department of Supportive Care
610 University Avenue Room 16-757
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 4270
Fax: (416) 946-2866
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.C. Mak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mak ( CPSO# 84519 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Palliative Care
Room 16-757
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHUI CHUNG ERNIE MAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2009